This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2023 at 06:01:54 (UTC).

RHONDA SOJOURN VS JOHN DALMAU, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 RHONDA SOJOURN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOHN DALMAU,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4214

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOJOURN RHONDA

Defendants

DALMAU JOHN

DALMAU MARLY

SAFAEI PARANDOSH

SAGAL DANIEL

VALLEY AFFORDABLE HOUSING LLC

WILLIAMS JEROME POWELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETERSON KIRT J

Defendant Attorneys

GENTINO ROBERT E.

KATZ LIOR

SALTZ MICHAEL JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Answer

5/12/2023: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mo...) of 04/28/2023, Final Trial Preparation

4/28/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mo...) of 04/28/2023, Final Trial Preparation

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mo...)

4/28/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mo...)

Reply (name extension) Reply supporting demurrer to FAC

4/21/2023: Reply (name extension) Reply supporting demurrer to FAC

Opposition (name extension) Opposition PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS VALLEY AFFORDABLE LIVING LLC AND PARANDOSH SAFAEl'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPO

4/3/2023: Opposition (name extension) Opposition PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS VALLEY AFFORDABLE LIVING LLC AND PARANDOSH SAFAEl'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Stipulation and Order (name extension) Joint Stipulation of Plaintiff and Defendants to Continue the Demurrer and CMC and Order

3/14/2023: Stipulation and Order (name extension) Joint Stipulation of Plaintiff and Defendants to Continue the Demurrer and CMC and Order

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Joint Stipulation to Continue the Demurrer and...) of 03/14/2023, Joint Stipulation and Order

3/14/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Joint Stipulation to Continue the Demurrer and...) of 03/14/2023, Joint Stipulation and Order

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order re Joint Stipulation to Continue the Demurrer and...)

3/14/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order re Joint Stipulation to Continue the Demurrer and...)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/1/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

2/27/2023: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Case Management Statement

2/27/2023: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

2/27/2023: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

2/23/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/23/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/23/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/31/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/26/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Answer

1/26/2023: Answer

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/25/2024

Hearing03/25/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2024

Hearing03/14/2024 at 10:30 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023

DocketAnswer; Filed by: Valley Affordable Housing LLC (Defendant); Parandosh Safaei (Defendant); As to: Rhonda Sojourn (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023

DocketJury Trial scheduled for 03/25/2024 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/14/2024 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023

DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mo...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mo...) of 04/28/2023, Final Trial Preparation; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/28/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 updated: Result Date to 04/28/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023

DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 04/28/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 updated: Result Date to 04/28/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023

DocketUpdated -- Demurrer - without Motion to Strike: Filed By: Parandosh Safaei (Defendant),Valley Affordable Housing LLC (Defendant); Result: Overruled ; Result Date: 04/28/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
91 More Docket Entries
07/27/2022

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2022

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael L. Stern in Department 62 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2022

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/07/2022 at 09:15 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2022

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/01/2022 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2022

DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2022

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2022

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Rhonda Sojourn (Plaintiff); As to: John Dalmau (Defendant); Marly Dalmau (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Rhonda Sojourn (Plaintiff); As to: John Dalmau (Defendant); Marly Dalmau (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2022

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2022

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less