This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 01:33:45 (UTC).

RHONDA SANTILLI VS CHI MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC

Case Summary

On 07/06/2017 RHONDA SANTILLI filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CHI MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARC MARMARO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7696

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARC MARMARO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SANTILLI RHONDA

Defendants and Respondents

CROSSMARK MANAGEMENT GROUP GP LLC

CHI MANAGEMETN GROUP LLC

DOES 1 TO 50

CHI MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC

CROSSMARK INC.

CROSSMARK INC. DBA CROSSMARK MANAGEMENT GROUP GP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ROTHMAN JAY S. ESQ.

JAY S. ROTHMAN & ASSOCIATES

ROTHMAN JAY STUART

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART P.C

OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART PC

Other Attorneys

MOON ALIS MARIE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/22/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (C.C.P., ? 170.6)

2/8/2019: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (C.C.P., ? 170.6)

Minute Order

2/22/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

2/22/2019: Unknown

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

2/22/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/26/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/27/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/28/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

3/13/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/18/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

3/28/2019: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

3/14/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

DECLARATION OF SERVICE

3/22/2018: DECLARATION OF SERVICE

Unknown

10/17/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/17/2017: Unknown

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

10/18/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order

10/18/2017: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

10/20/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 37; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 58; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Crossmark, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Rhonda Santilli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Rhonda Santilli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Crossmark, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 37; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (IN CHAMBERS COURT ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S PEREMPTORY CHAL...) of 02/22/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Crossmark, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Rhonda Santilli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. RETALIATION IN VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY (LABOR CODE 1102.5); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Rhonda Santilli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: BC667696 Hearing Date: September 1, 2021 Dept: 58

Judge John P. Doyle

\r\n\r\n

Department\r\n58

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Hearing\r\nDate: September 1, 2021

\r\n\r\n

Case\r\nName: Santilli v. Chi\r\nManagement Group, LLC, et al.

\r\n\r\n

Case\r\nNo.: BC667696

\r\n\r\n

Matter: Motion for Summary\r\nJudgment/Adjudication

\r\n\r\n

Moving\r\nParty: Defendant Crossmark,\r\nInc.

\r\n\r\n

Responding\r\nParty: Unopposed

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Tentative Ruling: The Motion for Summary Judgment is granted.

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Defendant\r\nCrossmark, Inc. seeks summary judgment or, alternatively, adjudication of all\r\ncauses of action as well as the issue of punitive damages.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

As\r\nthe Motion is unopposed, it is granted. \r\n(Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 8.54(c); Sexton\r\nv. Superior Court (1997) 58 Cal.App.4th 1403, 1410.)

\r\n\r\n

'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chi Management Group LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CROSSMARK INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOON ALIS M.