This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2023 at 07:07:55 (UTC).

RHONDA MORALES, AN INDIVIDUAL VS DELUXE MED SPA, APC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 RHONDA MORALES, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DELUXE MED SPA, APC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1687

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORALES AN INDIVIDUAL RHONDA

Defendants

ARTLINE MED SPA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DELUXE MED SPA APC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DO M.D. AN INDIVIDUAL KEVIN TIEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRISMER MARC

Defendant Attorney

HOFFMAN BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/4/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/4/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/4/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/4/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/7/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/7/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/30/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

12/13/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

12/22/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

Answer

12/22/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/22/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2023
  • Hearing04/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department G at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • Hearing04/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department G at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Deluxe Med Spa, APC a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY; Filed by: Deluxe Med Spa, APC a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Deluxe Med Spa, APC a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketNotice Notice of Case Reassignment; Filed by: Rhonda Morales, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pomona Courthouse South in Department G - Hon. Salvatore Sirnaeffective 12/09/2022; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- 04/04/2023 Case Management Conference: Location changed from Department A to Department G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- 04/04/2023 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service: Location changed from Department A to Department G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Salvatore Sirna in Department A Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Rhonda Morales, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Deluxe Med Spa, APC a California corporation (Defendant); Artline Med Spa, a California corporation (Defendant); Kevin Tien Do, M.D., an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Rhonda Morales, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Deluxe Med Spa, APC a California corporation (Defendant); Artline Med Spa, a California corporation (Defendant); Kevin Tien Do, M.D., an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Rhonda Morales, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Deluxe Med Spa, APC a California corporation (Defendant); Artline Med Spa, a California corporation (Defendant); Kevin Tien Do, M.D., an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less