This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/27/2022 at 14:57:45 (UTC).

RHODERY WADE VS CITY OF POMONA

Case Summary

On 11/29/2021 RHODERY WADE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF POMONA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3452

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WADE RHODERY

Defendant

CITY OF POMONA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEMMING MICHAEL G. JANZ

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/29/2021: Complaint

PI General Order

12/21/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAMIAN A. NORTHCUTT RE GOOD FAITH ATTEMPT TO MEET AND CONFER

2/8/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAMIAN A. NORTHCUTT RE GOOD FAITH ATTEMPT TO MEET AND CONFER

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2024
  • Hearing11/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • Hearing05/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • Hearing05/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (of Damian A. Northcutt re Good Faith Attempt to Meet and Confer); Filed by City of Pomona (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rhodery Wade (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rhodery Wade (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rhodery Wade (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rhodery Wade (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF POMONA A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION is a litigant