This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2021 at 07:17:26 (UTC).

RHNEE HARRIS VS ARIENNE DONNE BURRIS

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 RHNEE HARRIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ARIENNE DONNE BURRIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1886

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS RHNEE

Defendant

BURRIS ARIENNE DONNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHABY DAVID MICHAEL II

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/26/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

4/6/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

4/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Request for Dismissal

10/4/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Rhnee Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rhnee Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rhnee Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rhnee Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHABY DAVID MICHAEL II