This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/31/2020 at 17:14:51 (UTC).

RHINO BARE PROJECTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL. VS CANICO CAPITAL GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/06/2019 RHINO BARE PROJECTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Business Governance lawsuit against CANICO CAPITAL GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMANTHA JESSNER and GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3391

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business Governance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SAMANTHA JESSNER

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Defendants and Plaintiffs

CANICO CAPITAL GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

RHINO BARE PROJECTS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ASSIL ABRAHAM

WEST BEST CAPITAL GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RUSS LARRY C.

MEYER NATHAN D.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/20/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/20/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2020

4/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/19/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/27/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/27/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

8/22/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 08/22/2019

8/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 08/22/2019

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/12/2019

8/12/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/12/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/6/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/6/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • Hearing07/31/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Hearing07/31/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Service) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • Docketat 12:57 PM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/14/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Service) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2019
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 1, Samantha Jessner, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to Independent Calendar Court) of 08/22/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to Independent Calendar Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 82; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER) of 08/12/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (COURT ORDER)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rhino Bare Projects, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rhino Bare Projects, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); Canico Capital Group, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rhino Bare Projects, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); Canico Capital Group, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rhino Bare Projects LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUSS LARRY C.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEYER NATHAN