This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/11/2019 at 00:37:25 (UTC).

RG LLC VS RAZORGATOR INTERACTIVE GROUP INC

Case Summary

On 05/04/2018 RG LLC filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against RAZORGATOR INTERACTIVE GROUP INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4813

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RG LLC

Defendant

RAZORGATOR INTERACTIVE GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENDER RON ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

9/26/2018: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FOLLOWING ENTRY OF DEFAULT; DECLARATION OF BETH ANN R. YOUNG IN SUPPORT THEREOF

9/26/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FOLLOWING ENTRY OF DEFAULT; DECLARATION OF BETH ANN R. YOUNG IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Minute Order

9/26/2018: Minute Order

ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF RG (ASSIGNMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF CREDITORS), LLC'S REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT

9/26/2018: ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF RG (ASSIGNMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF CREDITORS), LLC'S REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT

JUDGMENT

9/26/2018: JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

10/2/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Minute Order

8/27/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

8/8/2018: Unknown

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/6/2018: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Unknown

7/6/2018: Unknown

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/6/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

2ND AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/9/2018: 2ND AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

6/19/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/11/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/14/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

5/7/2018: VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by RG, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50; Status Conference (Status Conference; Court makes order) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FOLLOWING ENTRY OF DEFAULT; DECLARATION OF BETH ANN R. YOUNG IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketORDER RE: PLAINTIFF RG (ASSIGNMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF CREDITORS), LLC'S REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketJUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by RG, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by RG, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by RG, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RG, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

LEVENE, NEALE, BENDER, YOO & BRILL L.L.P.

RON BENDER (State Bar No. 143364)

BETH ANN R. YOUNG (State Bar No. 143945)

10250 Constellation Boulevard, Suite 1700 Los Angeles, California 90067 Telephone: (310) 229-1234

Facsimile: (310) 229-1244

Attorneys for Plaintiff RG (assignment for the benefit of creditors), LLC, a California limited liability company, in its sole and limited capacity as Assignee for the Benefit of Creditors of RazorGator, Inc., a California corporation

FILED

Superior Court of California County of Lns Anoeles

MAY 16 2016

Sherri R. Carter, Executive Officer/Clerk of Cobrt By ’ [

; g o gputy Raul Sgncher

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES—CENTRAL DIVISION

RG (assignment for the benefit of creditors), LLC, a California limited liability company, in its sole and limited capacity as Assignee for the Benefit of Creditors of RazorGator, Inc., a California corporation,

Plaintiff, VS. RazorGator Interactive Group, Inc., a Delaware

corporation, and DOE 1 through DOE 10, inclusive, |

Defendants.

Case No. BC 704813 [Unlimited Jurisdiction]

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet Dept. 50

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAZORGATOR INTERACTIVE GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where R.G. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENDER RON ESQ.