This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 04:15:23 (UTC).

RFF FAMILY PARTNERSHIP, LP VS ALAN FRIEDMAN COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2020 RFF FAMILY PARTNERSHIP, LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALAN FRIEDMAN COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0692

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RFF FAMILY PARTNERSHIP LP

Defendants

ALAN FRIEDMAN COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SILVAGNI LAYNA AKA LAYNA FRIEDMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWNSTEIN DAVID

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/6/2020: Request for Dismissal

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/19/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/12/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/12/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/12/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/14/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by RFF Family Partnership, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by RFF Family Partnership, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by RFF Family Partnership, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RFF Family Partnership, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALAN FRIEDMAN COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where RFF FAMILY PARTNERSHIP LP is a litigant