This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 11:49:30 (UTC).

REZA KALANTARI VS VICTORIA LINDA ROBLES ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/05/2017 REZA KALANTARI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VICTORIA LINDA ROBLES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5493

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KALANTARI REZA

Defendants and Respondents

ROBLES RANGSIMA

ROBLES VICTORIA LINDA

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BOOKER II ROBERT L. ESQ.

BOOKER ROBERT L II

Defendant Attorneys

EDGERTON ROBERT HAMILTON ESQ.

SPRIGGS SCOTT BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/23/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Personal Service

1/31/2018: Proof of Personal Service

DEMAND FOR JURY

2/22/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

2/22/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

2/22/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Association of Attorney

8/1/2018: Association of Attorney

Unknown

12/7/2018: Unknown

Notice of Motion

4/18/2019: Notice of Motion

Notice of Ruling

4/22/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

4/22/2019: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

4/22/2019: Ex Parte Application

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

12/8/2017: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

CoverSheet

12/5/2017: CoverSheet

Summons

12/5/2017: Summons

Complaint

12/5/2017: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial and All Discovery Cutoff Deadlines for 90 Days) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and All Dis...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Reza Kalantari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial and All Discovery Cutoff Deadlines for 90 Days); Filed by Reza Kalantari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Motion to Compel (the Deposition Attendance of Defendant Victoria Linda Robles); Filed by Reza Kalantari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Reza Kalantari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Association of Attorney; Filed by Victoria Linda Robles (Defendant); Rangsima Robles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2018
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Reza Kalantari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Reza Kalantari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Reza Kalantari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC685493    Hearing Date: January 02, 2020    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO REOPEN PERCIPIENT DISCOVERY

On December 5, 2017, plaintiff Reza Kalantari filed this action against defendants Victoria Linda Robles (“Victoria”) and Rangsima Robles for injuries and damages from a May 11, 2017 automobile collision. Plaintiff was rear-ended by a vehicle driven by Victoria. Plaintiff seeks to reopen percipient discovery to find, subpoena, and depose Victoria’s passenger at the time of the accident.

Except as otherwise provided, any party shall be entitled as a matter of right to complete discovery proceedings on or before the 30th day, and to have motions concerning discovery heard on or before the 15th day, before the date initially set for trial of the action. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2024.020, subd. (a).) On motion of any party, the court may grant leave to complete discovery proceedings, or to have a motion concerning discovery heard, closer to the initial trial date, or to reopen discovery after a new trial date has been set. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2024.050, subd. (a).) The court shall take into consideration any matter relevant to the leave requested, including, but not limited to: (1) the necessity and the reasons for the discovery, (2) the diligence or lack of diligence of the party seeking the discovery or the hearing of a discovery motion, and the reasons that the discovery was not completed or that the discovery motion was not heard earlier, (3) any likelihood that permitting the discovery or hearing the discovery motion will prevent the case from going to trial on the date set, or otherwise interfere with the trial calendar, or result in prejudice to any other party, and (4) the length of time that has elapsed between any date previously set, and the date presently set, for the trial of the action.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 2024.050, subd. (b).)

Victoria’s passenger, Alberto Lugo, were co-workers at the time of the accident. Victoria identified him at her Victoria’s deposition on August 5, 2019. Since then, Plaintiff has been trying to locate him. Plaintiff states he tried to subpoena the custodian of records at UCLA and Lugo’s last place of employment to obtain his address but could not serve the Notice of Consumer on Lugo because his address was unknown. Instead, Plaintiff now states he will take the deposition of these custodians of record to discover Alberto’s address.

Trial is currently scheduled for March 6, 2020. The limited discovery into Lugo’s address and Lugo’s deposition may be completed before trial. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff’s motion to reopen discovery limited to discovery to locate and depose Lugo. The cutoff date for completing this discovery is February 21, 2020.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.