This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 22:33:51 (UTC).

REYNA RIVERA VS BURLINGTON STORES, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 REYNA RIVERA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BURLINGTON STORES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0760

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIVERA REYNA

Defendant

BURLINGTON STORES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURRAY BRUCE THOMAS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2024
  • Hearing09/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • Hearing12/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • Hearing11/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Reyna Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Reyna Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Reyna Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURLINGTON STORES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURRAY BRUCE T.