Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 10:03:58 (UTC).

REYNA MELENDEZ VS THE MADERA GROUP, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2018 REYNA MELENDEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against THE MADERA GROUP, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7660

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MELENDEZ REYNA

Defendants

THE MADERA GROUP LLC

TOCA MADERA WEHO LLC

TOCAYA MANAGEMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIMONJYAN RUBEN

Attorney at Employees' Legal Advocates, LLP

811 Wilshire Blvd. Ste. 800

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant Attorney

ROZEN RICARDO

Attorney at Raines Feldman LLP

1800 Avenue Of The Stars Fl 12

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

5/2/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/6/2019: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

5/6/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Case Management Statement

4/30/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

3/27/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Deposit - Jury

3/12/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Case Management Statement

3/14/2019: Case Management Statement

Declaration

3/20/2019: Declaration

Answer

2/19/2019: Answer

Notice

1/28/2019: Notice

Proof of Personal Service

1/18/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/21/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Change of Firm Name

12/24/2018: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Proof of Personal Service

12/20/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Status Conference and Order

12/11/2018: Notice of Status Conference and Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/6/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/6/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/6/2018: Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • Docketat 11:36 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Joint Stipulation to Arbitrate Case and Stay ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re: Joint Stipulation to Arbitrate Case and Stay ...) of 05/06/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Status Conference (reArbitration) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference re: Arbitration)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by The Madera Group, LLC (Defendant); Tocaya Management, LLC (Defendant); Toca Madera Weho, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Initial Status Conference (and proof of service as to all parties.) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference and proof of service as to all part...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (or Raina Singer re: Status Conference and Order); Filed by Reyna Melendez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by The Madera Group, LLC (Defendant); Tocaya Management, LLC (Defendant); Toca Madera Weho, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Reyna Melendez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Reyna Melendez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Reyna Melendez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Reyna Melendez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Reyna Melendez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Reyna Melendez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Reyna Melendez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOCA MADERA WEHO LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIMONJYAN RUBEN