This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 06:20:09 (UTC).

REX GLENSY VS PHILIPPE DIAZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/06/2017 REX GLENSY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PHILIPPE DIAZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5864

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GLENSY REX

Defendants and Respondents

CINEMA LIBRE STUDIOS

ABDELKADER PRODUCTION LLC

DOES 1-25

SCENERIES ENTERTAINMENT CORP

DIAZ PHILIPPE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SEGAL LAWRENCE

 

Court Documents

Motion for Protective Order

11/9/2018: Motion for Protective Order

Motion for Protective Order

11/9/2018: Motion for Protective Order

Request for Dismissal

2/1/2019: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • at 08:35 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order (of Materials in Discovery) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Rex Glensy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANTS PHILIPPE DIAZ; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Rex Glensy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Rex Glensy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTIES, BREACH OF CONTRACT, BREACH OF THE IMPLIED COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING, TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE WITH CONTRACT, TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE WITH. PROSPECTIVE ECONOMIC ADVANTAGE, PROMISSORY ESTOPPEL, MONEY HAD AN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Rex Glensy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

SEGAL LAW GROUP

LAWRENCE SEGAL [BARNO. 101339) ED ANDREW D. SHUPE [BAR NO. 240635] Superior Court of California 9100 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 616E unty of Los Angeles Beverly Hills, California 90212-3557

Telephone: (310) 550-4840 DEC 12 2017

Facsimile: (310) 550-4848

Sheri R. Carter, Executive Officer!Clerk Attorneys for Defendants/Cross-Complainants By Depuly Philippe Diaz and Sceneries Entertainment Corp. Jenny Chea and Defendant Abdelkader Production LLC

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Case No.: BC645864 Assigned to Hon. Randolph M. Hammock in Department 47

REX GLENSY, an individual,

CROSS-COMPLAINANTS’ OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINT

PHILIPPE DIAZ, an individual; SCENERIES ENTERTAINMENT CORP., a California Corporation, d/b/a CINEMA LIBRE STUDIOS; ABDELKADER PRODUCTION LLC, a California Limited Liability Company; and DOES 1-25, inclusive,

Reservation ID: 170814242388

Date: December 26, 2017 Time: 8:30 a.m. Dept.: 47