Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/20/2021 at 14:47:44 (UTC).

REVITALIZATION PARTNERS, INC., SOLELY IN ITS CAPACITY AS RECEIVER FOR APPLIED RESTORATION, INC. VS BERNARDS BUILDERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 REVITALIZATION PARTNERS, INC , SOLELY IN ITS CAPACITY AS RECEIVER FOR APPLIED RESTORATION, INC filed an Other lawsuit against BERNARDS BUILDERS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. FAHEY and TERRY GREEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5826

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REVITALIZATION PARTNERS INC. SOLELY IN ITS CAPACITY AS RECEIVER FOR APPLIED RESTORATION INC.

Defendant

BERNARDS BUILDERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RASCH FAYE C

Defendant Attorney

EATON LUKE NICHOLAS

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail

1/12/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Reply - REPLY TO BERNARDS BUILDERS, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

1/12/2021: Reply - REPLY TO BERNARDS BUILDERS, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALAN DAVIS

12/21/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALAN DAVIS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; HEARING ON MOTION - ...)

12/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; HEARING ON MOTION - ...)

Request for Judicial Notice

11/12/2020: Request for Judicial Notice

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/13/2020

11/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/13/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING OUTCOME OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

11/17/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING OUTCOME OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Request for Judicial Notice

11/25/2020: Request for Judicial Notice

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS (I) SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING OUTCOME OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND (II) OPPOSITION TO

11/25/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS (I) SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING OUTCOME OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND (II) OPPOSITION TO

Opposition - OPPOSITION BERNARDS BUILDERS INC.'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF ANCILLARY RECEIVER

11/30/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION BERNARDS BUILDERS INC.'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF ANCILLARY RECEIVER

Proof of Service by Mail

12/3/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

10/28/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

10/19/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALAN DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF RECEIVER'S MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF ANCILLARY RECEIVER

10/1/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALAN DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF RECEIVER'S MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF ANCILLARY RECEIVER

Proof of Service by Mail

9/28/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Complaint

9/17/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • Hearing05/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • Hearing01/20/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Revitalization Partners, Inc., solely in its capacity as Receiver for Applied Restoration, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketReply (to Bernards Builders, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration); Filed by Revitalization Partners, Inc., solely in its capacity as Receiver for Applied Restoration, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketOpposition (Bernards Builders Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration); Filed by Bernards Builders, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Revitalization Partners, Inc., solely in its capacity as Receiver for Applied Restoration, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Motion (for Reconsideration of Order on Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation); Filed by Revitalization Partners, Inc., solely in its capacity as Receiver for Applied Restoration, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Alan Davis); Filed by Revitalization Partners, Inc., solely in its capacity as Receiver for Applied Restoration, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketMotion for Reconsideration; Filed by Revitalization Partners, Inc., solely in its capacity as Receiver for Applied Restoration, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Revitalization Partners, Inc., solely in its capacity as Receiver for Applied Restoration, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Alan Davis in Support of Receiver's Motion for the Appointment of Ancillary Receiver); Filed by Revitalization Partners, Inc., solely in its capacity as Receiver for Applied Restoration, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketMotion re: (Receiver's Motion for the Appointment of Ancillary Receiver); Filed by Revitalization Partners, Inc., solely in its capacity as Receiver for Applied Restoration, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Revitalization Partners, Inc., solely in its capacity as Receiver for Applied Restoration, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Revitalization Partners, Inc., solely in its capacity as Receiver for Applied Restoration, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Revitalization Partners, Inc., solely in its capacity as Receiver for Applied Restoration, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Revitalization Partners, Inc., solely in its capacity as Receiver for Applied Restoration, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BERNARDS BUILDERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant