This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 14:45:20 (UTC).

REUBEN LOPEZ VS CIRCLE K STORES INC., A TEXAS CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 REUBEN LOPEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CIRCLE K STORES INC , A TEXAS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0408

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ REUBEN

Defendant

CIRCLE K STORES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAZANDJIAN HAIG B.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/9/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/9/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/9/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/9/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/9/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/11/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

1/23/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/27/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/10/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Request for Dismissal

3/8/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Reuben Lopez on 01/09/2023, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Reuben Lopez as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Reuben Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/22/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketNotice OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: Reuben Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: Circle K Stores Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/22/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Circle K Stores Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from CIRCLE K STORES INC. to Circle K Stores Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Haig B. Kazandjian (Attorney): Middle Name changed from B to B.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketAddress for Haig B. Kazandjian (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- CIRCLE K STORES INC. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from CIRCLE K STORES INC., a Texas Corporation to CIRCLE K STORES INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketAddress for Haig B Kazandjian (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Reuben Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: CIRCLE K STORES INC., a Texas Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 01/10/2023; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Reuben Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Reuben Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Reuben Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: CIRCLE K STORES INC., a Texas Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Curtis A. Kin in Department 72 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less