This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/07/2023 at 19:15:24 (UTC).

REUBEN LOPEZ VS CIRCLE K STORES INC., A TEXAS CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 REUBEN LOPEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CIRCLE K STORES INC , A TEXAS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0408

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ REUBEN

Defendant

CIRCLE K STORES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAZANDJIAN HAIG B.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/9/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/9/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/9/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/9/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/9/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/11/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

1/23/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/27/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2023
  • Hearing05/22/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/22/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Circle K Stores Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from CIRCLE K STORES INC. to Circle K Stores Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Haig B. Kazandjian (Attorney): Middle Name changed from B to B.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketAddress for Haig B. Kazandjian (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- CIRCLE K STORES INC. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from CIRCLE K STORES INC., a Texas Corporation to CIRCLE K STORES INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Haig B Kazandjian (Attorney): Organization Name changed from H.B.K. Lawyers APC to Haig B. Kazandjian Lawyers APC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketAddress for Haig B Kazandjian (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Reuben Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: CIRCLE K STORES INC., a Texas Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 01/10/2023; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Reuben Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Reuben Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Reuben Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: CIRCLE K STORES INC., a Texas Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Curtis A. Kin in Department 72 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less