This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2020 at 18:19:37 (UTC).

RETINA INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA VS. KRISTIE LOUIE LIN, MD

Case Summary

On 09/25/2017 RETINA INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA filed an Other lawsuit against KRISTIE LOUIE LIN, MD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. MATZ, OTHER DISTRICT JUDGE and CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7157

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. MATZ

OTHER DISTRICT JUDGE

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

RETINA INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA MEDICAL

TOM CHANG AN INDIVIDUAL

RETINA INSTIUTE OF CALIFORNIA MEDICAL

ACUITY EYE GROUP A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM

MICHAEL SAMUEL AN INDIVIDUAL

MICHAEL SAMUEL AN

TOM CHANG AN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LIN KRISTIE LOUIE MD AN INDIVIDUAL

KRISTIE L LIN M.D INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP

LIN MD KRISTIE LOUIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KALADJIAN LAW OFFICE

SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GIZZI REEP FOLEY

STONER & GRANNIS LLP

GIZZI L STEPHEN

Cross Defendant Attorneys

KALADJIAN HRAIR

WEISS JASON ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/23/2019: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 10/10/2019

10/10/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 10/10/2019

Substitution of Attorney

3/8/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-07-12 00:00:00

3/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-07-12 00:00:00

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/28/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/22/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-02-22 00:00:00

2/22/2018: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-02-22 00:00:00

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-03-16 00:00:00

3/16/2018: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-03-16 00:00:00

Substitution of Attorney

5/22/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Motion to Compel Arbitration -

7/20/2018: Motion to Compel Arbitration -

Other - - Receipt of check in the amount of one hundred and fifty dollars ($150.00)

2/9/2018: Other - - Receipt of check in the amount of one hundred and fifty dollars ($150.00)

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Ex-Parte Application

10/4/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Ex-Parte Application

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

10/25/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-12-12 00:00:00

12/12/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-12-12 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued

1/29/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

1/29/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

Motion to Compel Arbitration -

7/6/2018: Motion to Compel Arbitration -

Miscellaneous - CROSS-DEFENDANTS ACUITY EYE GROUP, MICHAEL SAMUEL, AND TOM CHANG'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF CROSS- CLAIMS; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SU

7/6/2018: Miscellaneous - CROSS-DEFENDANTS ACUITY EYE GROUP, MICHAEL SAMUEL, AND TOM CHANG'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF CROSS- CLAIMS; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SU

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by RETINA INSTIUTE OF CALIFORNIA MEDICAL (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by RETINA INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA MEDICAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MD, KRISTIE LOUIE LIN (Cross-Complainant); KRISTIE L LIN M.D INC., A CALIFORNIA CORP (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by RETINA INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA MEDICAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MD, KRISTIE LOUIE LIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Parties' Joint Arbitration Status Report and Stipulation and Proposed Order re Continuance of Arbitration Status Conference); Filed by RETINA INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA MEDICAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
155 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketNotice (Of Order to Show Cause Re Failure to Comply with Trial Court Delay Reduction Act)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-09-25 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketRestraining Order; Filed by RETINA INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA MEDICAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketEx-Parte Application; Filed by RETINA INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA MEDICAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketRestraining Order (TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketEx-Parte Application (FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND TEMPORARY RESTRAIING ORDER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF HARRY KALADJIAN ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less