This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2021 at 21:15:32 (UTC).

RESPONSIBLE GROWTH PALMDALE, ET AL. VS THE CITY OF PALMDALE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/05/2020 RESPONSIBLE GROWTH PALMDALE filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against THE CITY OF PALMDALE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMANTHA JESSNER, RICHARD L. FRUIN and DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0484

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SAMANTHA JESSNER

RICHARD L. FRUIN

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

L.A. DEPOSITIONS INC.

Petitioners and Appellants

RESPONSIBLE GROWTH PALMDALE

BENNETT KRISTIN

Defendants and Respondents

THE PALMDALE CITY COUNCIL

THE PALMDALE PLANNING COMMISSION

THE CITY OF PALMDALE

THE LOS ANGELES COUNTY BOARD OF SUPERVISORS

COYNE DEVELOPMENT

Interested Party and Respondent

COYNE DEVELOPMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

FINNEY TAL C

FINNEY TAL C.

TEPPER R. BRUCE

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ROSEQUIST MARGARET W.

DORAN NOEL J.

TANGRI SHIRAZ D.

TANGRI SHIRAZ

TANGRI SHIRAZ DINSHAW

BROWER NEILL E.

Respondent and Interested Party Attorney

BROWER NEILL E.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

2/3/2021: Notice of Ruling

Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SHIRAZ D. TANGRI IN SUPPORT OF REPLY FOR MOTION FOR A NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER VACATING OR CORRECTING AUGUST 4, 2020 MINUTE ORDER (EXHIBIT D)

10/22/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SHIRAZ D. TANGRI IN SUPPORT OF REPLY FOR MOTION FOR A NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER VACATING OR CORRECTING AUGUST 4, 2020 MINUTE ORDER (EXHIBIT D)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHIRAZ D. TANGRI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR A NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER VACATING OR CORRECTING AUGUST 4, 2020 MINUTE ORDER (EXHIBITS A-C)

9/23/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHIRAZ D. TANGRI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR A NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER VACATING OR CORRECTING AUGUST 4, 2020 MINUTE ORDER (EXHIBITS A-C)

Notice - NOTICE PETITIONERS' NOTICE OF ERRATUM

9/15/2020: Notice - NOTICE PETITIONERS' NOTICE OF ERRATUM

Judgment

9/10/2020: Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

8/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 08/04/2020

8/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 08/04/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE * * CEQA * *; DEMURRER - ...)

7/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE * * CEQA * *; DEMURRER - ...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENTS DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN CONNECTION THEREWITH

6/19/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENTS DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN CONNECTION THEREWITH

Reply - REPLY TO PETITIONERS OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO DISMISS

6/25/2020: Reply - REPLY TO PETITIONERS OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO DISMISS

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

6/8/2020: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Case Management Statement

5/27/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/18/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal

4/3/2020: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO CERTIFY A-R

4/1/2020: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO CERTIFY A-R

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

2/6/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

2/5/2020: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE); Filed by The City of Palmdale (Respondent); The Palmdale City Council (Respondent); The Palmdale Planning Commission (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice (ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)); Filed by Responsible Growth Palmdale (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Clerk's Notice of Abandonment of Appeal (NOA: 09/14/20 B308348); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by The City of Palmdale (Respondent); The Palmdale City Council (Respondent); The Palmdale Planning Commission (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • Docketat 2:39 PM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter of 11/09/20;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketOrder (Ruling on submitted matter of 11/09/20); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter of 11/09/20;) of 01/28/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Order (by Respondents For a Nunc Pro Tunc Order Vacating or Correcting August 4 2020 Minute Order [116106602661]*) - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketNotice (of CEQA Settlement Meeting); Filed by The City of Palmdale (Respondent); The Palmdale City Council (Respondent); The Palmdale Planning Commission (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docketat 09:09 AM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re CEQA Case Assignment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re CEQA Case Assignment) of 02/11/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by Responsible Growth Palmdale (Petitioner); Kristin Bennett (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Responsible Growth Palmdale (Petitioner); Kristin Bennett (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketVerified Petition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by Responsible Growth Palmdale (Petitioner); Kristin Bennett (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Request for Administrative Record); Filed by Responsible Growth Palmdale (Petitioner); Kristin Bennett (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COYNE DEVELOPMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where PALMDALE CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where L.A. DEPOSITIONS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF PALMDALE A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION is a litigant