This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2019 at 08:49:20 (UTC).

RESEDA URGENT CARE, INC., ET AL. VS COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2018 RESEDA URGENT CARE, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YOLANDA OROZCO and MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6681

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YOLANDA OROZCO

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

RESEDA URGENT CARE INC.

CANOGA PARK URGENT CARE FAMILY MEDICINE INC.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

ABBASI MATTHEW

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

STEINBERG CRAIG S

STEINBERG CRAIG S.

5737 Kanan Rd # 540

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

STEINBRERG CRAIG S

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/10/2019

9/10/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/10/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; CASE MANAGE...)

8/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; CASE MANAGE...)

Answer - ANSWER FIRST-AMENDED ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/22/2019: Answer - ANSWER FIRST-AMENDED ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; CASE MANAGE...)

5/1/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; CASE MANAGE...)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE BAILA M. STRAUSS CSR 14251

5/1/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE BAILA M. STRAUSS CSR 14251

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/19/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

4/23/2019: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint FIRST

2/21/2019: Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint FIRST

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

3/14/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Request for Judicial Notice

3/14/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/11/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing

12/26/2018: Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling and Case Reassignment

12/27/2018: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling and Case Reassignment

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/30/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

12/14/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Defendant Community Family Care Medical Group, IPA, Inc. Pere...) of 12/14/2018

12/14/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Defendant Community Family Care Medical Group, IPA, Inc. Pere...) of 12/14/2018

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Status of Cross-complaint) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Cross-complaint)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/10/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manage...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketReply (to Opposition to Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint); Filed by Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Defendant Community Family Care Medical Group, IPA, Inc. Pere...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Reseda Urgent Care, Inc. (Plaintiff); Canoga Park Urgent Care Family Medicine, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Reseda Urgent Care, Inc. (Plaintiff); Canoga Park Urgent Care Family Medicine, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Reseda Urgent Care, Inc. (Plaintiff); Canoga Park Urgent Care Family Medicine, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketComplaint (1st); Filed by Reseda Urgent Care, Inc. (Plaintiff); Canoga Park Urgent Care Family Medicine, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEINBERG, CRAIG S.