This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2020 at 00:17:35 (UTC).

RENZONG ZHAO ET AL VS ELENA ORTEGA TARRONAS

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 RENZONG ZHAO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ELENA ORTEGA TARRONAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG, PETER A. HERNANDEZ and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0588

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ZHAO XUEZHONG

ZHAO RENZONG

ZHAO XUEJUN

Defendants and Respondents

TARRONAS ELENA ORTEGA

DOES 1-100

SAN GABRIEL VALLEY CHILDREN'S CARE INC

HOLY FAMILY CHILDREN'S CARE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WARD AUSTIN ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ZUREK RONALD ESQ.

SHAYNE JOSHUA

SITAR LAURA K.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER;)

5/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER;)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER REINSTATING THE TRIAL DATE AS WELL AS ALL PENDING HEARING DATES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARAT

3/11/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER REINSTATING THE TRIAL DATE AS WELL AS ALL PENDING HEARING DATES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARAT

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/4/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL

2/18/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANTS HOLY FAMILY AND SAN GABRIEL VALLEY CHILDREN'S CARE SERVICES. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT;

1/27/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANTS HOLY FAMILY AND SAN GABRIEL VALLEY CHILDREN'S CARE SERVICES. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT;

Notice of Ruling

1/29/2020: Notice of Ruling

Joinder

12/19/2019: Joinder

Order - ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANTS, HOLY FAMILY CHILDREN'S CARE, INC. AND SAN GABRIEL VALLEY CHILDREN'S CARE, INC'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TRIAL DATE

12/20/2019: Order - ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANTS, HOLY FAMILY CHILDREN'S CARE, INC. AND SAN GABRIEL VALLEY CHILDREN'S CARE, INC'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TRIAL DATE

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MSJ

11/1/2019: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MSJ

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PASCUAL IN SUPPORT OF MSJ

11/1/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PASCUAL IN SUPPORT OF MSJ

Motion for Summary Judgment

11/1/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Separate Statement

11/1/2019: Separate Statement

Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER

8/6/2019: Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/3/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO HAVE ANSWER DEEMED FILED)

5/31/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO HAVE ANSWER DEEMED FILED)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8/14/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT ELENA ORTEGA TARRONAS TO COMPLAINT

5/15/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT ELENA ORTEGA TARRONAS TO COMPLAINT

SUMMONS -

4/4/2018: SUMMONS -

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Renzong Zhao (Plaintiff); Xuejun Zhao (Plaintiff); Xuezhong Zhao (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order;) of 05/14/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (the Depositions of Gerardo Pascual, Bridgette Ruelos, and Lilia Pleyto) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order;) of 04/27/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Renzong Zhao (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Elena Ortega Tarronas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT ELENA ORTEGA TARRONAS TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Renzong Zhao (Plaintiff); Xuejun Zhao (Plaintiff); Xuezhong Zhao (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Renzong Zhao (Plaintiff); Xuejun Zhao (Plaintiff); Xuezhong Zhao (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC700588    Hearing Date: March 02, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

RENZONG ZHAO, ET AL.,

Plaintiff,

v.

ELENA ORTEGA TARRONAS, ET AL.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC700588

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 31 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE EAST DISTRICT, JUDGE PETER A. HERNANDEZ presiding in DEPT. O of the POMONA Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.

DATED: March 2, 2020 ___________________________

Hon. Jon Takasugi

Judge of the Superior Court