Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/06/2021 at 15:38:05 (UTC).

RENO HARDWARE & SUPPLY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS CONSTRUCTURE INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 RENO HARDWARE SUPPLY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CONSTRUCTURE INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2640

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RENO HARDWARE & SUPPLY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION

ARAGON PROPERTY CORPORATION AN UNKNOWN ENTITY

PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY A NEBRASKA CORPORATION

ARAGON TOLUCA/COLTON PROPERTIES CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ARAGON LA CONSTRUCTION MGMT. CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CONSTRUCTURE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PLUMTREE A. MARIA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Lis Pendens

4/2/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/2/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/2/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • Hearing08/27/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • Hearing08/11/2021 at 09:15 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Reno Hardware & Supply, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Reno Hardware & Supply, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Reno Hardware & Supply, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Reno Hardware & Supply, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RENO HARDWARE & SUPPLY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CONSTRUCTURE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant