This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/13/2020 at 23:25:59 (UTC).

RENEE BALDWIN VS HMH PROPERTY INVESTMENTS LP ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/25/2018 RENEE BALDWIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HMH PROPERTY INVESTMENTS LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7753

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BALDWIN RENEE

TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

HMH PROPERTY INVESTMENTS LP

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

HARVEY CAPITAL CORP.

HERNANDEZ MARIO

A.M. P.M. BUILDING MAINTENANCE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

A.M. P.M. BUILDING MAINTENANCE INC. DOE 1

HMH PROPERTY INVESTMENTS LP.

HERNANDEZ DOE 2 MARIO

ROES 1-X INCLUSIVE

A.M.P.M. BUILDING MAINTENANCE COMPANY INC.

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court

TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ORZZELLO PRATICE PC THE

FISCHER-REYES JENNA

OZZELLO MARK A. ESQ.

GREIFINGER DAVID R.

FISCHER-REYES JENNA ESQ.

GREIFINGER DAVID R. ESQ.

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

SETCHELL JOHN LUKE

SETCHELL JOHN LUKE ESQ.

ESTRADA JENNIFER A.

ESTRADA JENNIFER A. ESQ.

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

FISCHER-REYES JENNA

FISCHER-REYES JENNA ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN L. SETCHELL IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (HMH) AND SANCTIONS

12/9/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN L. SETCHELL IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (HMH) AND SANCTIONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (- HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVE...)

12/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (- HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVE...)

Notice of Ruling

12/11/2019: Notice of Ruling

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

11/8/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

11/8/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

11/8/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Separate Statement

11/8/2019: Separate Statement

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/29/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Association of Attorney

9/30/2019: Association of Attorney

Notice of Ruling

10/1/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/24/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/11/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Motion

4/11/2019: Notice of Motion

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/28/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/31/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

6/14/2019: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS FOR COMPLAINT-IN-INVENTIONS

6/18/2019: Summons - SUMMONS FOR COMPLAINT-IN-INVENTIONS

TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF LIEN AS TO PLAINTIFF

7/24/2018: TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF LIEN AS TO PLAINTIFF

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • Hearing05/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Hearing02/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • Hearing01/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, AND RELATED MOTION / DISCOVERY DATES); Filed by Renee Baldwin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Renee Baldwin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Harvey Capital Corp. (Cross-Complainant); HMH Property Investments LP (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (Compelling Defendant Harvey Capital Corp's Responses to Special Interrogatories (Set One); Request for Monetary Sanctions Against the Defendant, Filed by the Plaintiff) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (Compelling Defendant Harvey Capital Corp's Responses to Form Interrogatories (Set One); Request for Monetary Sanctions Against the Defendant, Filed by the Plaintiff) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketMotion for Leave (to File a Complaint-In-Intervention;); Filed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Renee Baldwin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketTWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF LIEN AS TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by Lien Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Renee Baldwin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Renee Baldwin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. NEGLIGENCE PER SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC707753    Hearing Date: December 10, 2019    Dept: 2

Baldwin v. HMH Property Investments LP et al.

Plaintiff’s Four Motions to Compel Responses to Form and Special Interrogatories served on Defendants, HMH Property Investments, LP and Harvey Capital Corp.; Request for Sanctions are TAKEN OFF CALENDAR.

Plaintiff asks for an order to compel further responses to written discovery served on Defendants on 7/9/19. Defendants served responses on 9/24/19. Declaration of Calvin Marshall, ¶ 6. Plaintiff contends that objections made by Defendant are without merit and that substantive responses are evasive and incomplete.

Motions that seek a further response to written discovery require that the parties first participate in an Informal Discovery Conference with the court. Standing Order Re: Personal Injury Procedures, Central District, ¶¶ 12-13, effective 9/26/18. The court’s file does not indicate that the Plaintiff requested or that the parties participated in an IDC with respect to the discovery at issue prior to the hearing on the motions.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.