Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2021 at 13:57:09 (UTC).

RENE MAURICIO CATIVO VS MCKENZIE SELIG, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 RENE MAURICIO CATIVO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MCKENZIE SELIG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0969

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CATIVO RENE MAURICIO

Defendants

BOURGON MARY JANICE

SELIG MCKENZIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SALDANA KATHRYN

Other Attorneys

CRUZ RAQUEL

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/16/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal

3/9/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/15/2021: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

2/17/2021: PI General Order

Answer

2/9/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

1/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/11/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (NOT ENTERED, DUPLICATE); Filed by Rene Mauricio Cativo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Rene Mauricio Cativo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Rene Mauricio Cativo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Mary Janice Bourgon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Rene Mauricio Cativo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rene Mauricio Cativo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rene Mauricio Cativo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rene Mauricio Cativo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRUZ RAQUEL