This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/21/2021 at 19:35:10 (UTC).

RENE FLORES VS SANDRA PAULETTE DELEON

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 RENE FLORES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SANDRA PAULETTE DELEON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5943

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORES RENE

Defendant

DELEON SANDRA PAULETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALGORRI ERNEST

Defendant Attorney

MARTIN MICHAEL G.

 

Court Documents

Answer

12/15/2020: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/18/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

PI General Order

10/5/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

10/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/22/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/21/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2023
  • Hearing09/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • Hearing03/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • Hearing03/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sandra Paulette Deleon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Rene Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Rene Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rene Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rene Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rene Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTIN MICHAEL G. ESQ.