This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 02:35:02 (UTC).

RENE AREVALO, ET AL. VS ANZA MANAGEMENT COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 RENE AREVALO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ANZA MANAGEMENT COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9633

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HORTA JUDITH

AREVALO RENE

AREVALO MAYLEEN

AREVALO SEBASTIAN

Defendants

SPECTRUM PACIFIC WEST LLC

SYLMAR APTS. INC.

ANZA MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LLOREDA CARLOS

LLOREDA CARLOS A. JR

Defendant Attorney

LEE CLAYTON TAYLOR

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 07/14/2021

7/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 07/14/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

7/14/2021: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

6/28/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/29/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

4/29/2021: Answer

Request for Dismissal

4/8/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

4/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR SEBASTIAN

3/24/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR SEBASTIAN

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/11/2021: Complaint

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MAYLEEN

3/15/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MAYLEEN

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

3/22/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR SEBASTIAN

3/22/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR SEBASTIAN

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • Hearing01/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • Hearing01/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 07/14/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by ANZA MANAGEMENT COMPANY (Defendant); SYLMAR APTS., INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by ANZA MANAGEMENT COMPANY (Defendant); SYLMAR APTS., INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by RENE AREVALO (Plaintiff); JUDITH HORTA (Plaintiff); MAYLEEN AREVALO (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ANZA MANAGEMENT COMPANY (Defendant); SYLMAR APTS., INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by RENE AREVALO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by RENE AREVALO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by RENE AREVALO (Plaintiff); JUDITH HORTA (Plaintiff); MAYLEEN AREVALO (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Sebastian); Filed by RENE AREVALO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Mayleen); Filed by RENE AREVALO (Plaintiff); JUDITH HORTA (Plaintiff); MAYLEEN AREVALO (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by RENE AREVALO (Plaintiff); JUDITH HORTA (Plaintiff); MAYLEEN AREVALO (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Sebastian); Filed by RENE AREVALO (Plaintiff); JUDITH HORTA (Plaintiff); MAYLEEN AREVALO (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RENE AREVALO (Plaintiff); JUDITH HORTA (Plaintiff); MAYLEEN AREVALO (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SYLMAR APTS. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SPECTRUM PACIFIC WEST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ANZA MANAGEMENT COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE CLAYTON T.