This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2022 at 15:49:23 (UTC).

RENE A POLANCO VS PHH CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 RENE A POLANCO filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against PHH CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4230

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POLANCO RENE A

Defendants

AND ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT TITLE STATE LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THIS COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS TITLE THERETO

CIT BANK A CORPORATION

CIT CREDIT GROUP USA INC DBA ONEWEST BANK FSB. A CORPORATION

CIT GROUP/BCC INC. A CORPORATION

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE AGENCY COMPANY A FLORIDA CORPORATION

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

INDY MAC BANK FSB

INNOVATIVE MORTGAGE CAPITAL LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MORALES CARLOS

OCWEN FINANCIAL CORPORATION

OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PHH CORPORATION

PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION

U.S. BANCORP A CORPORATION

WESTERN PROGRESSIVE LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/29/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/29/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/29/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/29/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/29/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/5/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/5/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2022
  • Hearing09/16/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • Hearing09/16/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rene A Polanco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rene A Polanco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHH CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where OCWEN FINANCIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where Indy Mac Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY, A CORPORATION is a litigant