This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/19/2022 at 09:11:03 (UTC).

RENDA KAY PETTIS, AN INDIVIDUAL VS FELIX CONSTANTINO DIAZ, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 RENDA KAY PETTIS, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FELIX CONSTANTINO DIAZ, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7170

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETTIS AN INDIVIDUAL RENDA KAY

Defendants

DIAZ AN INDIVIDUAL FELIX CONSTANTINO

PATRIOT ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOTANJIAN A. J.

Defendant Attorney

VIEIRA LORI L.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/8/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

11/2/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

11/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/28/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

12/28/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2024
  • Hearing10/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • Hearing04/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • Hearing03/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Patriot Environmental Services, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Patriot Environmental Services, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Renda Kay Pettis, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Renda Kay Pettis, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Renda Kay Pettis, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Renda Kay Pettis, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PATRIOT ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOTANJIAN A. J.