This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/05/2019 at 20:18:57 (UTC).

REKO HOLDINGS LLC VS ACAP FINANCIAL INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/20/2017 REKO HOLDINGS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ACAP FINANCIAL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7661

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REKO HOLDINGS LLC

Defendants

GSS GROUP LLC

AMP GROUP HOLDINGS INC.

CITIBANK N.A.

ACAP FINANCIAL INC.

ALPINE SECURITIES CORP.

ADAMS DAVID

HANIN VLADIMIR

EMPIRE STOCK TRANSFER INC.

SHIRINYAN GARY

HJK TRADE INC.

KOZLOV PAUL

PATIN LISANDRA

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

KOSTANDYAN HOVIK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YASPAN ROBERT A.

Defendant Attorneys

BARTON KLUGMAN & OETTING LLP APC

KEESAL YOUNG & LOGAN

PLC BASKIN RICHARDS

SEVERSON & WERSON APC [LOS ANGELES]

BAKERHOSTETLER

MURPHY ROSEN LLP

HAKALA BRAD A.

SEVERSON & WERSON APC [SAN FRANCISCO]

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

8/16/2018: SUMMONS

Notice

5/10/2019: Notice

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

4/2/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

4/4/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

4/4/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

4/4/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

4/4/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

4/4/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/15/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINE BY 120 DAYS

5/16/2018: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINE BY 120 DAYS

JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION BY ALL PARTIES TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF BRAD HAKALA, ESQ. IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF RO

6/12/2018: JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION BY ALL PARTIES TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF BRAD HAKALA, ESQ. IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF RO

DECLARATION OF ROBERT M. YASPAN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF THE PARTIES? JOINT EXPJ4RTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES

6/12/2018: DECLARATION OF ROBERT M. YASPAN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF THE PARTIES? JOINT EXPJ4RTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES

Minute Order

6/12/2018: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF BRAD A. HAKALA, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF THE PARTIES? JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES

6/12/2018: DECLARATION OF BRAD A. HAKALA, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF THE PARTIES? JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES

DECLARATION OF TATYANA MENACHIAN RE NOTICE OF JOINT EX P4RTE APPLICATION BY ALL PARTIES TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES

6/12/2018: DECLARATION OF TATYANA MENACHIAN RE NOTICE OF JOINT EX P4RTE APPLICATION BY ALL PARTIES TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES

DECLARATION OF MARK I. WRAIGHT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

6/27/2018: DECLARATION OF MARK I. WRAIGHT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

6/27/2018: DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

6/27/2018: DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketNotice (of attorneys charging lien); Filed by Reko Holdings, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department 36; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-10-03 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 36; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-09-10 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Service; Filed by Reko Holdings, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
188 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 37; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-02-01 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDJCLAL OFFICER (CODE CIV PROC. SECTION 17O.6)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Reko Holdings, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • DocketUNLIMITED CIVIL ACTION 1. CONVERSION ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

ORL JINAL ACTIUMLLP ' | =N

Allan D. Johnson, Bar No. 217346 Su nor';!,‘;ntof. California

99 S. Lake Ave., Suite 501 ountv of Los Anaeles

Pasadena, CA 91101

Phone: 626-644-5881 | DEC. 11 2017

Email: ajohnson@actiumllp.com Sherri R. Las uiive Officer/Clerk By . Deputy

S den

Attorneys for Defendants

VLADIMIR HANIN, HOVIK KOSTANDYAN, HJK TRADE, INC., GARY SHIRINY AN,

and PAUL KOZLOV

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

REKO HOLDINGS, LLC, Case No. BC647661 Plamuif, Hon. Gregory W. Alarcon, Dept. 36 VSs. | DEFENDANT GARY SHIRINYAN ’S?é ACAP FINANCIAL, INC. et al., ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED

COMPLAINT | T

Defendants.

Complaint Filed: Jan. 20, 2017 ; Trial Date: Oct. 10, 2018

Defendant GARY SHIRINY AN denies and alleges as follows:

GENERAL DENIAL

1. Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure § 431.30(d), Defendant denies

génerally each and every allegation of Plaintiff’s First Amended Complaint, and further

denies that Plaintiff is entitled to any relief or damages.

Answer to First Amended Complaint

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALPINE SECURITIES CORP. is a litigant