This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2021 at 05:12:25 (UTC).

REINHOLD, RACHEL - IN THE MATTER OF

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 REINHOLD, RACHEL - IN THE MATTER OF was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAREZ, DANIEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4128

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAREZ, DANIEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RUBIO TAYLOR NICOLE

Not Classified By Court

REINHOLD RACHEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHANG RANDY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

9/15/2021: Minute Order

Petition - Determine Succession to Real Prop (Initial)

4/28/2021: Petition - Determine Succession to Real Prop (Initial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • Hearing01/06/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Petition Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Petition Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketPetition - Determine Succession to Real Prop (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANG RANDY