This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/06/2021 at 13:40:20 (UTC).

REINALDO D AGUILAR VS TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 REINALDO D AGUILAR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U S A , INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4258

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AGUILAR REINALDO D

AGUILAR REINALDO D.

Defendant

TOYOTA MOTOR SALES U.S.A. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NGUYEN ATHENA

Defendant Attorney

MURPHY THOMAS MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Other - - OTHER - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)

7/16/2021: Other - - OTHER - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [OTHER - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)]

7/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [OTHER - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)]

Answer

7/30/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

7/30/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Personal Service

7/6/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/30/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • Hearing10/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Other - Notice of Case Management Conference Statement and Addendum (Joint)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketOther - (Notice of Case Management Conference Statement and Addendum (Joint)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Reinaldo D. Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Reinaldo D. Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Reinaldo D. Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Reinaldo D. Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Toyota Motor Sales U S A Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURPHY THOMAS MATTHEW