This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/24/2022 at 03:47:16 (UTC).

REINA GARCIA, ET AL. VS RASHON CAVINESS

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 REINA GARCIA, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RASHON CAVINESS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4282

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARCIA REINA

SANCHEZ A MINOR DYLAN

SANCHEZ DORA

Defendant

CAVINESS RASHON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAMARI BOBBY

Defendant Attorney

REISINGER ROBERT L.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/27/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/27/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

7/27/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Complaint

7/27/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

7/27/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DYLAN

8/8/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DYLAN

Demand for Jury Trial

9/28/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

9/28/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/28/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2024
  • Hearing07/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2024
  • Hearing01/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2024
  • Hearing01/10/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Rashon Caviness (Defendant); As to: Reina Garcia (Plaintiff); Dora Sanchez (Plaintiff); Dylan Sanchez, a minor (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Rashon Caviness (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Rashon Caviness (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Reina Garcia (Plaintiff); Dora Sanchez (Plaintiff); Dylan Sanchez, a minor (Plaintiff); As to: Rashon Caviness (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Dylan; Signed and Filed by: Reina Garcia (Plaintiff); Dora Sanchez (Plaintiff); Dylan Sanchez, a minor (Plaintiff); As to: Dylan Sanchez, a minor (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Dylan: Filed By: Reina Garcia (Plaintiff),Dylan Sanchez, a minor (Plaintiff),Dora Sanchez (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/10/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Reina Garcia (Plaintiff); Dora Sanchez (Plaintiff); Dylan Sanchez, a minor (Plaintiff); As to: Rashon Caviness (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Reina Garcia (Plaintiff); Dora Sanchez (Plaintiff); Dylan Sanchez, a minor (Plaintiff); As to: Rashon Caviness (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAMARI BOBBY