This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/30/2022 at 19:30:43 (UTC).

REHABBERS FINANCIAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DBA AZTEC FINANCIAL VS MEK ACQUISITIONS, LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 REHABBERS FINANCIAL, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DBA AZTEC FINANCIAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MEK ACQUISITIONS, LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL L. LOFTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0961

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOEL L. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REHABBERS FINANCIAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA AZTEC FINANCIAL

Defendants

MEK ACQUISITIONS LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BERRY KENNETH D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALLER BRUCE B

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

3/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

1/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DE...)

10/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DE...)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/16/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE...)

8/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE...)

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/10/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/10/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/10/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/10/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 05/27/2021

5/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 05/27/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF T...)

3/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF T...)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/15/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/15/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/15/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/15/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/28/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • Hearing04/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department X at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • Hearing04/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department X at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department X, Joel L. Lofton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department X, Joel L. Lofton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department X, Joel L. Lofton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department X, Joel L. Lofton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rehabbers Financial, Inc., a California corporation, dba Aztec Financial (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rehabbers Financial, Inc., a California corporation, dba Aztec Financial (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rehabbers Financial, Inc., a California corporation, dba Aztec Financial (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rehabbers Financial, Inc., a California corporation, dba Aztec Financial (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rehabbers Financial, Inc., a California corporation, dba Aztec Financial (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEK ACQUISITIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where REHABBERS FINANCIAL INC. DBA AZTEC FINANCIAL A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PALLER BRUCE B