Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2020 at 20:18:11 (UTC).

REGAN-PALISADES POST 283, THE AMERICAN LEGION, DEPARTMENT OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION VS SUNSET LA CRUZ INVESTORS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/20/2020 REGAN-PALISADES POST 283, THE AMERICAN LEGION, DEPARTMENT OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against SUNSET LA CRUZ INVESTORS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0607

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REGAN-PALISADES POST 283 THE AMERICAN LEGION DEPARTMENT OF CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION

Defendants

SUNSET LA CRUZ INVESTORS 2 LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SUNSET LA CRUZ INVESTORS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAULY ANDREW S

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/22/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA

6/1/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA

Notice - NOTICE EXHIBITS TO COMPLAINT

5/1/2020: Notice - NOTICE EXHIBITS TO COMPLAINT

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/27/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/27/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/27/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/20/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/20/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/20/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Regan-Palisades Post 283, The American Legion, Department Of California, a California nonprofit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Errata); Filed by Regan-Palisades Post 283, The American Legion, Department Of California, a California nonprofit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketNotice (Exhibits to Complaint); Filed by Regan-Palisades Post 283, The American Legion, Department Of California, a California nonprofit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Regan-Palisades Post 283, The American Legion, Department Of California, a California nonprofit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Regan-Palisades Post 283, The American Legion, Department Of California, a California nonprofit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Regan-Palisades Post 283, The American Legion, Department Of California, a California nonprofit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Regan-Palisades Post 283, The American Legion, Department Of California, a California nonprofit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Regan-Palisades Post 283, The American Legion, Department Of California, a California nonprofit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Regan-Palisades Post 283, The American Legion, Department Of California, a California nonprofit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAULY ANDREW STUART