This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2022 at 16:44:43 (UTC).

REDIGER INVESTMENT CORPORATION VS BENITO PEDRAZA

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 REDIGER INVESTMENT CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BENITO PEDRAZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5462

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REDIGER INVESTMENT CORPORATION

Defendant

PEDRAZA BENITO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DURINGER STEPHEN CHRISTOPHER

DURINGER STEPHEN C.

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

12/8/2021: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

11/8/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

11/8/2021: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/8/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

11/8/2021: Request for Dismissal

Application - APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

11/8/2021: Application - APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

Judgment

11/22/2021: Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE)

10/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE) OF 10/26/2021

10/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE) OF 10/26/2021

Case Management Statement

10/20/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

10/18/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

10/14/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/4/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/7/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Rediger Investment Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Rediger Investment Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by Rediger Investment Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by Rediger Investment Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Rediger Investment Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Rediger Investment Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketApplication (Application for Entry of Default Judgment by Court); Filed by Rediger Investment Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docketat 1:51 PM in Department 49, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Rediger Investment Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE); Filed by Rediger Investment Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Rediger Investment Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Rediger Investment Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rediger Investment Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rediger Investment Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rediger Investment Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REDIGER INVESTMENT CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DURINGER STEPHEN C.