This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2022 at 13:06:00 (UTC).

REDA, ALI - IN THE MATTER OF

Case Summary

On 01/24/2022 REDA, ALI - IN THE MATTER OF was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAREZ, DANIEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0729

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAREZ, DANIEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RIDA YOUSSEF AL

Claimants

PONTAZA JULIO

PONTAZA VALENTE

Not Classified By Court

REDA ALI

GUTIERREZ RUBEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LEHN RICHARD ANTON

 

Court Documents

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

1/24/2022: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Corrections

3/25/2022: Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Corrections

Letters (Initial)

3/24/2022: Letters (Initial)

Bond - suretec

3/24/2022: Bond - suretec

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative - Duties and Liabilities

3/10/2022: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative - Duties and Liabilities

Order - Probate

3/9/2022: Order - Probate

Minute Order

3/3/2022: Minute Order

Supplement - Supplement

2/25/2022: Supplement - Supplement

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

2/15/2022: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

2/10/2022: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Miscellaneous Document - Supplement

6/23/2022: Miscellaneous Document - Supplement

Creditor's Claim - Valente Pontaza $contingent/unliquidated

7/14/2022: Creditor's Claim - Valente Pontaza $contingent/unliquidated

Creditor's Claim - Julio Pontaza- $ Contingent/Unliquidated

7/11/2022: Creditor's Claim - Julio Pontaza- $ Contingent/Unliquidated

Proof of Service

7/21/2022: Proof of Service

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2023
  • Hearing08/03/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketCreditor's Claim (Valente Pontaza $contingent/unliquidated ); Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketCreditor's Claim (Julio Pontaza- $ Contingent/Unliquidated ); Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document (Supplement ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketClerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Corrections

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketBond (suretec ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative (Duties and Liabilities ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketOrder - Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEHN RICHARD ANTON