This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/02/2021 at 18:25:57 (UTC).

RED BUS CHARTER COMPANY VS THE QUEEN MARY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 RED BUS CHARTER COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE QUEEN MARY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK C. KIM. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0282

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RED BUS CHARTER COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Defendants

THE QUEEN MARY

URBAN COMMONS LLC

AIMBRIDGE CONCESSIONS INC

EAGLE HOSPITALITY TRUST

EHT QMLB LLC

AIMBRIDGE HOSPITALITY

EVOLUTION HOSPITALITY

EHT QMLB LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

AIMBRIDGE CONCESSIONS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

APPEL RONALD

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SANDLER JONATHAN C.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

6/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

6/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

6/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

6/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

6/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

6/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

6/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

6/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

3/24/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Joinder

3/23/2021: Joinder

Answer

3/23/2021: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/26/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

2/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/26/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Case Management Statement

3/9/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/9/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/9/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Aimbridge Concessions, Inc (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Red Bus Charter Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Red Bus Charter Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Red Bus Charter Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Red Bus Charter Company (Plaintiff); Eagle Hospitality Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Red Bus Charter Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Red Bus Charter Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Red Bus Charter Company (Plaintiff); Urban Commons, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Red Bus Charter Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Red Bus Charter Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Red Bus Charter Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Red Bus Charter Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Red Bus Charter Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Red Bus Charter Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Red Bus Charter Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Red Bus Charter Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Red Bus Charter Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAGLE HOSPITALITY TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where THE QUEEN MARY is a litigant

Latest cases where EVOLUTION HOSPITALITY LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where URBAN COMMONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant