This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 10:15:41 (UTC).

RECIO YOUNG, ET AL. VS FCA US, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 RECIO YOUNG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7381

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CORTIER ROMI

YOUNG RECIO

Defendants

ALFA ROMEO MASERATI OF VAN NUYS

FCA US LLC

WESTBROOK RUSSEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOLIN TIONNA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/12/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

10/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service - No Service

10/28/2021: Proof of Service - No Service

Summons - SUMMONS AMENDED

10/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS AMENDED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • Hearing02/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by RECIO YOUNG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by RECIO YOUNG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (AMENDED); Filed by RECIO YOUNG (Plaintiff); ROMI CORTIER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by RECIO YOUNG (Plaintiff); ROMI CORTIER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by RECIO YOUNG (Plaintiff); ROMI CORTIER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RECIO YOUNG (Plaintiff); ROMI CORTIER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOLIN TIONNA