This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/24/2023 at 03:03:56 (UTC).

RECINOS HERNANDEZ , BARBARA TIFANY VS MENDEZ TORRES, JOSUE BLADIMIR

Case Summary

On 07/05/2022 RECINOS HERNANDEZ , BARBARA TIFANY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MENDEZ TORRES, JOSUE BLADIMIR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PELLMAN, AMY M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7228

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PELLMAN, AMY M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RECINOS HERNANDEZ BARBARA TIFANY

Respondent

MENDEZ TORRES JOSUE BLADIMIR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CABRERA CRISTAL LISA

 

Court Documents

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

7/5/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property - Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

7/5/2022: Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property - Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

Declaration - Income and Expense - Declaration - Income and Expense

7/5/2022: Declaration - Income and Expense - Declaration - Income and Expense

Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

7/5/2022: Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

Petition - Dissolution - Domestic Partners w/ Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution - Domestic Partners w/ Minor Child

7/5/2022: Petition - Dissolution - Domestic Partners w/ Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution - Domestic Partners w/ Minor Child

Declaration - Separate Property - Declaration - Separate Property

7/5/2022: Declaration - Separate Property - Declaration - Separate Property

Summons - Summons

7/5/2022: Summons - Summons

FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Case Status Conference - FCCR 1

10/11/2022: FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Case Status Conference - FCCR 1

Minute Order

11/2/2022: Minute Order

Request - Enter Default FL165 - Rejected - No valid POS & doc is incomplete

1/4/2023: Request - Enter Default FL165 - Rejected - No valid POS & doc is incomplete

Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons

1/4/2023: Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service of Summons ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165 (Rejected - No valid POS & doc is incomplete ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2A, Pellman, Amy M., Presiding; Case Review Conference - Held - FCCR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketNotice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (Noticed by LASC )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (Declaration - UCCJEA ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Separate Property (Declaration - Separate Property ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property (Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketSummons (Summons ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution - Domestic Partners w/ Minor Child (Petition - Dissolution - Domestic Partners w/ Minor Child ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense (Declaration - Income and Expense ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CABRERA CRISTAL L. ESQ.