This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 03:41:36 (UTC).

REBECCA LEVITSKY VS LAUREEN EDWARDS

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 REBECCA LEVITSKY filed an Other lawsuit against LAUREEN EDWARDS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0379

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEVITSKY REBECCA

Defendant

EDWARDS LAUREEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHULAK MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/15/2019: Request for Dismissal

Unknown

3/20/2019: Unknown

Unknown

3/20/2019: Unknown

Complaint

3/20/2019: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/20/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/21/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown

3/22/2019: Unknown

Unknown

3/22/2019: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Rebecca Levitsky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Laureen Edwards)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rebecca Levitsky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Complaint; Filed by Rebecca Levitsky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHULAK MICHAEL T.