This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 21:05:27 (UTC).

REBECCA LEVITSKY VS LAUREEN EDWARDS

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 REBECCA LEVITSKY filed an Other lawsuit against LAUREEN EDWARDS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0370

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEVITSKY REBECCA

Defendant

EDWARDS LAUREEN

Westlake Village, CA 91361

Not Classified By Court

ONE LEGAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHULAK MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/15/2019: Request for Dismissal

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike

4/18/2019: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/18/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Motion

4/18/2019: Notice of Motion

Summons

3/21/2019: Summons

Unknown

3/21/2019: Unknown

Unknown

3/21/2019: Unknown

Summons

3/19/2019: Summons

Unknown

3/19/2019: Unknown

Unknown

3/19/2019: Unknown

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/19/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/20/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Rebecca Levitsky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Notice of Motion; Filed by Laureen Edwards (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by Laureen Edwards (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Laureen Edwards)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by Rebecca Levitsky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by Rebecca Levitsky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Complaint; Filed by Rebecca Levitsky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rebecca Levitsky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONE LEGAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHULAK MICHAEL T.