This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 17:27:15 (UTC).

REBECCA CASTILLO VS WOOD RANCH BARBEQUE AND GRILL, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/01/2018 REBECCA CASTILLO filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against WOOD RANCH BARBEQUE AND GRILL, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0000

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTILLO REBECCA

Defendant

WOOD RANCH BARBEQUE AND GRILL INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANNING JOSEPH R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by REBECCA CASTILLO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by REBECCA CASTILLO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by REBECCA CASTILLO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wood Ranch Barbecue & Grill Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Manning, Jr, Joseph R