This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2023 at 00:44:50 (UTC).

REBECCA CASTILLO VS STERLING VENUE VENTURES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 REBECCA CASTILLO filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against STERLING VENUE VENTURES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMAS C. FALLS and PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1002

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

THOMAS C. FALLS

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTILLO REBECCA

Defendant

STERLING VENUE VENTURES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANNING JR. JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

KURTZ GARY ALAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/6/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/6/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/6/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/8/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/8/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;)

9/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/12/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

9/9/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/26/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/8/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Answer

12/21/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

1/4/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/18/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/27/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Dismissal

3/7/2023: Request for Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Rebecca Castillo on 09/06/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Rebecca Castillo as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Rebecca Castillo on 09/06/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Rebecca Castillo as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Rebecca Castillo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 04/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Joseph Manning Jr. (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketAddress for Joseph Manning Jr. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 04/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O updated: Result Date to 01/18/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Rebecca Castillo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pomona Courthouse South in Department R - Hon. Thomas C. Falls; Reason: Challenge / Recusal, by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Peter A. Hernandez in Department O Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Rebecca Castillo (Plaintiff); As to: STERLING VENUE VENTURES, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Rebecca Castillo (Plaintiff); As to: STERLING VENUE VENTURES, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Rebecca Castillo (Plaintiff); As to: STERLING VENUE VENTURES, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less