This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 05:14:44 (UTC).

REBECCA CASTILLO VS DITA, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/30/2019 REBECCA CASTILLO filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DITA, INC , A NEVADA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GLORIA WHITE-BROWN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0977

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GLORIA WHITE-BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTILLO REBECCA

Defendant

DITA INC. A NEVADA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANNING JOSEPH RICHARD

Defendant Attorney

RUMM JAMES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/31/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/30/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/30/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/30/2019: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/30/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

11/25/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

12/30/2019: Answer

Case Management Statement

3/11/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/27/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/17/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/24/2020

4/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/24/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Request for Dismissal

5/26/2020: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Rebecca Castillo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • Docketat 12:05 PM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/24/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Dita, Inc., A Nevada corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Rebecca Castillo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (P.O.S) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Dita, Inc., A Nevada corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Rebecca Castillo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rebecca Castillo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rebecca Castillo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rebecca Castillo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less