This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 10:11:06 (UTC).

REBECCA CASTILLO VS CABO CANTINA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/30/2018 REBECCA CASTILLO filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CABO CANTINA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GLORIA WHITE-BROWN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0149

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GLORIA WHITE-BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTILLO REBECCA

Defendant

CABO CANTINA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANNING JOSEPH RICHARD JR

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/30/2018: Complaint

Proof of Service by Mail

12/24/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/20/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Summons

11/30/2018: Summons

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/30/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service

12/27/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

2/19/2019: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Request for Dismissal

3/20/2019: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Rebecca Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Rebecca Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (proof of service) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Rebecca Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Rebecca Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rebecca Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rebecca Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CABO CANTINA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Manning, Jr, Joseph R