This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/11/2021 at 12:09:57 (UTC).

REBECCA CASTILLO VS BATH & BODY WORKS DIRECT, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 REBECCA CASTILLO filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against BATH BODY WORKS DIRECT, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0622

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTILLO REBECCA

Defendant

BATH & BODY WORKS DIRECT INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANNING JOSEPH RICHARD JR

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/2/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

7/30/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/18/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/23/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Personal Service

8/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

9/29/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Rebecca Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Rebecca Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rebecca Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rebecca Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rebecca Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BATH & BODY WORKS DIRECT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Manning, Jr, Joseph R