This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2022 at 10:19:54 (UTC).

REBECA SMITH VS CITY OF EL SEGUNDO, A CALIFORNIA GENERAL LAW MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 REBECA SMITH filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CITY OF EL SEGUNDO, A CALIFORNIA GENERAL LAW MUNICIPAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5795

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH REBECA

Defendant

CITY OF EL SEGUNDO A CALIFORNIA GENERAL LAW MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHELLY THOMAS H

URBAN ALEKSANDRA

LIPELES KEVIN A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/12/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/11/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/11/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/11/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

5/11/2022: Complaint

Notice of Removal to Federal Court - NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT NOTICE OF FILING REMOVAL OF ACTION

6/3/2022: Notice of Removal to Federal Court - NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT NOTICE OF FILING REMOVAL OF ACTION

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/20/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/14/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2022
  • Hearing09/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court (NOTICE OF FILING REMOVAL OF ACTION); Filed by CITY OF EL SEGUNDO, a California general law municipal corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by REBECA SMITH (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by REBECA SMITH (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by REBECA SMITH (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by REBECA SMITH (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF EL SEGUNDO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer URBAN ALEKSANDRA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIPELES KEVIN A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHELLY THOMAS H.