Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2021 at 04:41:28 (UTC).

RCSUS INC. VS A1 SOLAR POWER INC.

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 RCSUS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against A1 SOLAR POWER INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6474

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RCSUS INC. A CORPORATION

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10

A1 SOLAR POWER INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANKER JACQUELINE NANCY

Defendant Attorney

LUCERO LINDA D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by RCSUS INC. A CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by RCSUS INC. A CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by RCSUS INC. A CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketRequest-Enter Judgment; Filed by RCSUS INC. A CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by RCSUS INC. A CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by RCSUS INC. A CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketRequest-Enter Judgment; Filed by RCSUS INC. A CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketRequest-Enter Judgment; Filed by RCSUS INC. A CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by RCSUS INC. A CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by RCSUS INC. A CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by RCSUS INC. A CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketRequest-Dismissal-Partial; Filed by RCSUS INC. A CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by RCSUS INC. A CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketRequest-Enter Judgment; Filed by RCSUS INC. A CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by A1 SOLAR POWER INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RCSUS INC. A CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by RCSUS INC. A CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A1 SOLAR POWER INC AKA DAVID MACK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUCERO LINDA DARLENE