This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/24/2020 at 19:05:48 (UTC).

RCP HOLDINGS II, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS HARVARD TUTORS OF BRENTWOOD, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 RCP HOLDINGS II, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HARVARD TUTORS OF BRENTWOOD, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0235

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RCP HOLDINGS II LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

ALEXANDER AND ARISTOTLE BRENTWOOD STUDIO 001 LLC A CALILORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

JIANG MARGARET

EIDIA SANTA MONICA STUDIO 0001 LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

HARVARD TUTORS OF BRENTWOOD LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALEY ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

2/26/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

2/13/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/13/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/3/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/13/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

2/26/2020: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • Hearing08/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Case Management Conference); Filed by RCP HOLDINGS II, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by RCP HOLDINGS II, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by RCP HOLDINGS II, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by RCP HOLDINGS II, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by RCP HOLDINGS II, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RCP HOLDINGS II, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.