This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2023 at 11:29:09 (UTC).

RCP FINANCIAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA STOCK CORPORATION, ET AL. VS ELISHA PRISCYLLA LEIGH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/28/2022 RCP FINANCIAL, INC , A CALIFORNIA STOCK CORPORATION, filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against ELISHA PRISCYLLA LEIGH,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT and CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4672

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHINN HANNAH GRACE

SHINN ROBERT ISRAEL

7M FILMS INC.

RCP FINANCIAL INC.

SHEKINAH CHURCH

Defendants

CARROLL HALEY MARIE

GOLDMAN MELANIE LEE

LEIGH ELISHA PRISCYLLA

PHIPPS HALEY ELIZABETH

SHAFFER KAYLEY IRENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUTENPLAN DANIEL R

Defendant Attorney

BROWN ETHAN

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

3/6/2023: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service - No Service

3/3/2023: Proof of Service - No Service

Notice of Ruling

2/24/2023: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/11/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Ruling

1/4/2023: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE DECLARATION OF KYLIE DOUGLAS IN SUPPORT OF DEFT. MELANIE LEE'S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE

12/30/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE DECLARATION OF KYLIE DOUGLAS IN SUPPORT OF DEFT. MELANIE LEE'S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE

Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADINGS AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE

12/27/2022: Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADINGS AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE

Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLS. OF DOUGLAS, COLON, AND GOLDMAN TO ANTI-SLAPP

12/19/2022: Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLS. OF DOUGLAS, COLON, AND GOLDMAN TO ANTI-SLAPP

Declaration - DECLARATION ISO OPP. TO M. GOLDMAN ANTI-SLAPP MOTION

12/19/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION ISO OPP. TO M. GOLDMAN ANTI-SLAPP MOTION

Answer

3/23/2023: Answer

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

3/21/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/21/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE UNDER CCP SECTION 425.16 ...)

3/21/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE UNDER CCP SECTION 425.16 ...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT LEIGHS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ACCEPTING DEFENDANTS PROPOSED CROSS-COMPLAINT

3/20/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT LEIGHS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ACCEPTING DEFENDANTS PROPOSED CROSS-COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF LAUREN B. SHELBY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT LEIGHS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ACCEPTING DEFENDANTS PROPOSED CROSS-COMPLAINT

3/20/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF LAUREN B. SHELBY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT LEIGHS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ACCEPTING DEFENDANTS PROPOSED CROSS-COMPLAINT

Objection - OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT HAYLEY ELIZABETH PHIPPS: 1) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 425.16; 2) DECLARATION OF

3/20/2023: Objection - OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT HAYLEY ELIZABETH PHIPPS: 1) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 425.16; 2) DECLARATION OF

Request for Dismissal

3/20/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED

3/17/2023: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2023
  • Hearing06/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Melanie Lee Goldman (Defendant); As to: RCP Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff); 7M Films, Inc. (Plaintiff); Shekinah Church (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application for an Order Accepting Defendant's Proposed Cross-Complaint: Filed By: Haley Elizabeth Phipps (Defendant); Result: Granted in Part ; Result Date: 03/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Elisha Priscylla Leigh (Defendant); As to: RCP Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff); 7M Films, Inc. (Plaintiff); Shekinah Church (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketHearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) by Defendant, Haley Elizabeth Phipps [Res. ID# 660414367257] scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 76 updated: Result Date to 03/21/2023; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 76 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 06/21/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application or an Order Accepting Defendant's Proposed Cross-Complaint scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 76 updated: Result Date to 03/21/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketOpposition PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT LEIGHS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ACCEPTING DEFENDANTS PROPOSED CROSS-COMPLAINT; Filed by: RCP Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff); 7M Films, Inc. (Plaintiff); Shekinah Church (Plaintiff); Robert Israel Shinn (Plaintiff); Hannah Grace Shinn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
132 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Christopher K. Lui in Department 76 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: RCP FINANCIAL, INC., a California stock corporation (Plaintiff); 7M FILMS, INC., a California stock corporation (Plaintiff); SHEKINAH CHURCH, a California nonprofit corporation (Plaintiff); ROBERT ISRAEL SHINN (Plaintiff); HANNAH GRACE SHINN (Plaintiff); As to: ELISHA PRISCYLLA LEIGH (Defendant); MELANIE LEE GOLDMAN (Defendant); HALEY MARIE CARROLL (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: RCP FINANCIAL, INC., a California stock corporation (Plaintiff); 7M FILMS, INC., a California stock corporation (Plaintiff); SHEKINAH CHURCH, a California nonprofit corporation (Plaintiff); ROBERT ISRAEL SHINN (Plaintiff); HANNAH GRACE SHINN (Plaintiff); As to: ELISHA PRISCYLLA LEIGH (Defendant); MELANIE LEE GOLDMAN (Defendant); HALEY MARIE CARROLL (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: RCP FINANCIAL, INC., a California stock corporation (Plaintiff); 7M FILMS, INC., a California stock corporation (Plaintiff); SHEKINAH CHURCH, a California nonprofit corporation (Plaintiff); ROBERT ISRAEL SHINN (Plaintiff); HANNAH GRACE SHINN (Plaintiff); As to: ELISHA PRISCYLLA LEIGH (Defendant); MELANIE LEE GOLDMAN (Defendant); HALEY MARIE CARROLL (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less