This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 11:39:38 (UTC).

RAZOGATOR INTERACTIVE GROUP INC VS TUMBLING DICE LLC

Case Summary

On 12/21/2017 RAZOGATOR INTERACTIVE GROUP INC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against TUMBLING DICE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7892

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAZORGATOR INTERACTIVE GROUP INC.

Defendant

TUMBLING DICE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

HERZLICH ALLAN

HERZLICH ALLAN EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

DAVIS DAVID JASON

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/8/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

2/21/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

3/1/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

3/21/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANT TUMBLING DICE, LLC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/22/2018: DEFENDANT TUMBLING DICE, LLC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

4/24/2018: Minute Order

NOTCE OF RULING

4/26/2018: NOTCE OF RULING

Unknown

5/3/2018: Unknown

Unknown

5/14/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

5/16/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE RAZORGATOR INTERACTIVE GROUP, INC.'S PLACE OF INCORPORATION

5/24/2018: NOTICE OF ERRATA RE RAZORGATOR INTERACTIVE GROUP, INC.'S PLACE OF INCORPORATION

Notice

3/13/2019: Notice

Case Management Statement

4/3/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

4/4/2019: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

4/15/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

4/22/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/12/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

1/12/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 40; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 40; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Razorgator Interactive Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Razorgator Interactive Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Tumbling Dice, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Change of Address); Filed by Razorgator Interactive Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Razorgator Interactive Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-02-21 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Razorgator Interactive Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Razorgator Interactive Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (OVER $25,000.00) 1. FAILURE TO HONOR WAGE GARNISHMENT ORDER; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

HERZLICH & BLUM, LLP Attorneys-At-Law

ENCINO GATEWAY BUILDING

15760 VENTURA BOULEVARD, SUITE 850 - FILED

ENCINO, CALIFORNIA 91436-3095 : ~ Superior Court of California Telephone (818) 783-8991 County of Los Angeles Facsimile (818) 783-6682

Allan Herzlich State Bar #100920 - DEC 21 2011

Jerome™J. Blum State Bar #100317 Sherr ve Officer/Clerk

Marta Roza State Bar #307206 By Deput

—%M y ! flon Gomez Attorneys for Plaintiff

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT

BC68749,

RAZORGATOR INTERACTIVE CASE NO. . GROUP, INC., a California corporation, Unlimited Civil Jurisdiction Plaintiff, COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (Over $25,000.00)

TUMBLING DICE, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company; and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,

1. Failure to Honor Wage Garnishment Order

2. Failure to Honor Assignment Order

3. Failure to Honor Charging Order

Defendants.

N N N Naner” Nt s at”? e et et e e’ s’ “age’

Plaintiff, RAZORGATOR INTERACTIVE GROUP, INC,, alleges:

1. Plaintiff is informed and believes and, based thereon, alleges that Defendant TUMBLING DICE, LLC (hereafter “TDL”) is a Delaware limited liability company. |

2. - Plaintiff is informed and believes and, Based thereon, alleges that at all times mentiohed herein, each of the Defendants sued herein, including those sued as DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, were agents, servants, employees and/or alter ego of each of the other remaining ‘Defendants and in doing the things hereinafter alleged was acting within the full scope and

course of said agency, service and/or employment and with the full knowledge and consent, 1.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TUMBLING DICE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RAZORGATOR INTERACTIVE GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERZLICH ALLAN