This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/06/2021 at 10:33:57 (UTC).

RAYNA, CONSTANCE MAE VS ABE, STEVEN LYLE

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 RAYNA, CONSTANCE MAE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ABE, STEVEN LYLE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2609

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RAYNA CONSTANCE MAE

Respondent

ABE STEVEN LYLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRYAN SHARON ANN

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

3/1/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

1/8/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

1/26/2021: Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

Proof of Service - Mail

1/27/2021: Proof of Service - Mail

Notice - Notice of Firm Name Change

12/31/2020: Notice - Notice of Firm Name Change

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

1/8/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Proof of Service of Summons

12/29/2020: Proof of Service of Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

12/14/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

12/14/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons

12/14/2020: Summons

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

12/14/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

12/14/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Firm Name Change ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRYAN SHARON ANN